Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of Congress regarding the inability of American citizens to maintain regular contact with relatives in the Soviet Union.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/29/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/28/1987Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/11/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
10/27/1987HouseSee H.Con.Res.68.
08/24/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
08/24/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
08/03/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
08/03/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/29/1987SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/28/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
07/28/1987SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/28/1987SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/11/1987SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/11/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/25/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/10/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 04/21/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/22/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 04/22/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/22/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/23/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/23/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 04/28/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/28/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/28/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/28/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/29/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/29/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/29/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/29/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/06/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/06/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/06/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/06/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/08/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/08/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/14/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/14/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 05/19/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/03/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/09/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/11/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/16/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/16/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/19/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/19/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/23/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/26/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/26/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/30/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 07/07/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/07/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/17/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 07/17/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/21/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 07/23/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/28/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 07/28/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/29/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/11/1987 Referred to
07/28/1987 Markup by
07/28/1987 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs08/03/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East08/24/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations08/24/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.29. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/11/1987)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the promotion of unrestricted family visits between related people of the United States and the Soviet Union is an essential part of American policy toward the Soviet Union; and (2) the President, the Secretary of State, and other administration members should raise the issue of family visitation at all appropriate opportunities in discussions with leaders of the Communist Party and the Government of the Soviet Union.