Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/11/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 03/11/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/25/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/10/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 04/21/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/22/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 04/22/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/22/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/23/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/23/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 04/28/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/28/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/28/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/28/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/29/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/29/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/29/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/29/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/06/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/06/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/06/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/06/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/08/1987
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/08/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/14/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/14/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 05/19/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/03/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/09/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/11/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/16/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/16/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/19/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/19/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/23/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/26/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/26/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/30/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 07/07/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/07/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/17/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 07/17/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/21/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 07/23/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/28/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 07/28/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/29/1987