Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/17/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/17/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 03/03/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/17/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/02/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/12/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/18/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/05/1987