Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 01/06/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/12/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 01/12/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 01/12/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 01/12/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 02/05/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/26/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/23/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/22/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/29/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/29/1988