Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate August 1, 1987, as "Helsinki Human Rights Day".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/04/1987Became Public Law No: 100-82.
08/04/1987Signed by President.
07/30/1987Presented to President.
07/28/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
06/05/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/04/1987Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/02/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/04/1987Became Public Law No: 100-82.
08/04/1987Signed by President.
07/30/1987SenatePresented to President.
07/29/1987SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
07/28/1987HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
07/28/1987HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
07/28/1987HouseOrdered to be Reported.
07/28/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/30/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
06/09/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
06/09/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/09/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/05/1987SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/04/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 154.
06/04/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/04/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/02/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/02/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/02/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 06/02/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 06/02/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 06/02/1987

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/02/1987 Referred to
06/04/1987 Markup by
06/04/1987 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs06/09/1987 Referred to
07/28/1987 Markup by
House Post Office and Civil Service06/09/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population06/30/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.151. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/02/1987)

Designates August 1, 1987, as Helsinki Human Rights Day. Requests the President to: (1) reassert the American commitment to the Helsinki Accords; (2) raise the issue of noncompliance with such Accords with the Soviet Union, Bulgaria, Czechoslovakia, the German Democratic Republic, Hungary, Poland, and Romania; (3) convey to all signatories of such Accords that respect for human rights and fundamental freedoms is vital to progress in the ongoing Helsinki process; (4) convey to U.S. allies the necessity of unity regarding such Accords; (5) continue his efforts to achieve the release of political prisoners of the Soviet Union, an increase in Soviet emigration, resolution of family reunification cases, and cessation of radio transmission jamming; (6) seek the inclusion, in any concluding document agreed to in Vienna, of a mechanism to sustain human rights progress after the Vienna Conference on Security and Cooperation in Europe; and (7) convey to signatory states the desire of the United States for a result at Vienna that will not favor military security at the expense of human rights.