Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the period commencing on November 15, 1987, and ending on November 22, 1987, as "National Arts Week".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/12/1987Became Public Law No: 100-163.
11/12/1987Signed by President.
11/05/1987Presented to President.
11/03/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
06/25/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/23/1987Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/03/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/12/1987Became Public Law No: 100-163.
11/12/1987Signed by President.
11/05/1987SenatePresented to President.
11/05/1987SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
11/03/1987HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
11/03/1987HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
07/06/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
06/29/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
06/29/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/25/1987SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/23/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 195.
06/23/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/23/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/03/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 06/11/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/16/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/16/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/16/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/19/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/19/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 06/19/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 06/19/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/19/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/19/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/19/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/19/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 06/19/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/19/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/19/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/19/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/19/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/19/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 06/19/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/19/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 06/19/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/19/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/19/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/23/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/23/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/23/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/23/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/23/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 06/23/1987
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 06/23/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/23/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/23/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/23/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/23/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/23/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/23/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 06/23/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/23/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/23/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/23/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/24/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/24/1987
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/24/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 06/30/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/07/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/10/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/10/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/10/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/10/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/10/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 07/10/1987
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/10/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 07/10/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 07/10/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 07/10/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/10/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/10/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/03/1987 Referred to
06/23/1987 Markup by
06/23/1987 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service06/29/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population07/06/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.154. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/03/1987)

Designates November 15 through November 22, 1987, as National Arts Week.