Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution expressing the sense of the Congress that United Nations General Assembly Resolution 3379 (XXX) should be overturned, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/17/1987Became Public Law No: 100-169.
11/17/1987Signed by President.
11/10/1987Presented to President.
11/09/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 394 - 0 (Record Vote No: 422).
10/23/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/23/1987Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/20/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
11/17/1987Became Public Law No: 100-169.
11/17/1987Signed by President.
11/10/1987SenatePresented to President.
11/10/1987SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
11/09/1987HousePassed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 394 - 0 (Record Vote No: 422).
11/09/1987HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
11/05/1987HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/05/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/04/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
10/27/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/23/1987SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/23/1987SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/20/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations10/20/1987 Referred to
10/23/1987 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs11/04/1987 Referred to
11/05/1987 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.205. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/20/1987)

Recommends that the Government lend support to efforts to overturn United Nations General Assembly Resolution 3379 (XXX), which equates Zionism with racism.