Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate March 20, 1988, as "National Agriculture Day".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/23/1988Became Public Law No: 100-262.
03/23/1988Signed by President.
03/21/1988Presented to President.
03/17/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
03/17/1988House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/26/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/25/1988Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
03/23/1988Became Public Law No: 100-262.
03/23/1988Signed by President.
03/21/1988SenatePresented to President.
03/21/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
03/17/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
03/17/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
03/17/1988HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/17/1988HouseSubcommittee on Census and Population Discharged.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population
03/07/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/01/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/01/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/26/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/25/1988SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 566.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service03/01/1988 Referred to
03/17/1988 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/07/1988 Referred to
03/17/1988 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.265. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/25/1988)

Designates March 20, 1988, as National Agriculture Day.