Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the period commencing September 25, 1988 and ending on October 1, 1988, as " National Historically Black Colleges Week."


Actions Overview (8)

Date
09/26/1988Became Public Law No: 100-445.
09/26/1988Signed by President.
09/21/1988Presented to President.
09/16/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/16/1988House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/26/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/25/1988Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Byrd for Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
04/11/1988Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
09/26/1988Became Public Law No: 100-445.
09/26/1988Signed by President.
09/21/1988SenatePresented to President.
09/20/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/16/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
09/16/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
09/16/1988HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
08/01/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/26/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/25/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 811.
07/25/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Byrd for Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/14/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/11/1988SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 04/11/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 04/11/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/11/1988
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/11/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 04/11/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 04/11/1988

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/11/1988 Referred to
07/14/1988 Markup by
07/25/1988 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service08/01/1988 Referred to
09/16/1988 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.290. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/11/1988)

Designates the period commencing September 25, 1988, and ending October 1, 1988, as National Historically Black Colleges Week.