Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate August 1, 1988, as "Helsinki Human Rights Day".


Actions Overview (9)

Date
08/01/1988Became Public Law No: 100-377.
08/01/1988Signed by President.
07/25/1988Presented to President.
07/14/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
07/14/1988House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/1988House Committee on Foreign Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/08/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/08/1988Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/14/1988Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
08/01/1988Became Public Law No: 100-377.
08/01/1988Signed by President.
07/25/1988SenatePresented to President.
07/25/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
07/14/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
07/14/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/1988HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/1988HouseHouse Committee on Foreign Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/1988HouseSubcommittee on Census and Population Discharged.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population
07/13/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
07/11/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
07/11/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/08/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
07/08/1988SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/14/1988SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/14/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/14/1988
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/14/1988
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 06/14/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/16/1988

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/14/1988 Referred to
07/08/1988 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs07/11/1988 Referred to
07/14/1988 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service07/11/1988 Referred to
07/14/1988 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population07/13/1988 Referred to
07/14/1988 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.338. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/14/1988)

Designates August 1, 1988, as Helsinki Human Rights Day. Requests the President to: (1) reassert American commitment to the Helsinki Accords; (2) raise the issue of noncompliance with such Accords with the Soviet Union, Bulgaria, Czechoslovakia, the German Democratic Republic, Hungary, Poland, and Romania; (3) convey to all signatories of such Accords that respect for human rights and fundamental freedoms is vital to progress in the ongoing Helsinki process; (4) convey to U.S. allies the importance of unity regarding such Accords; (5) continue his efforts to achieve, before the end of the Vienna meeting, the release of all political prisoners of the Soviet Union, an increase in Soviet emigration, resolution of all family reunification cases, cessation of all radio transmission jamming, and the repeal of laws and practices which undermine human rights; (6) seek the inclusion, in any concluding document agreed to in Vienna, of a mechanism to sustain human rights progress after the Vienna meeting; and (7) convey to signatory states the insistence of the United States for a result at Vienna that will not favor military security at the expense of human rights.