Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 08/09/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 08/09/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 08/11/1988
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/11/1988
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 08/11/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 08/11/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/11/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 08/11/1988
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 08/11/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 08/11/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/11/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 08/11/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/07/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/07/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/07/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/07/1988
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/07/1988
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/07/1988
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/07/1988
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/07/1988
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/07/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 09/07/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 09/07/1988
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/07/1988
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/07/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/07/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/12/1988
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 09/12/1988
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 09/12/1988
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/12/1988
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/12/1988
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/12/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/13/1988
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/13/1988
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/13/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/14/1988
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/15/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 09/15/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/15/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/15/1988
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/15/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 09/15/1988
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/15/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 09/15/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/15/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/15/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/15/1988
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 09/15/1988
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/15/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/15/1988
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/15/1988
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 09/15/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 09/15/1988
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 09/15/1988
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/15/1988
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 09/15/1988
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/15/1988
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 09/15/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/19/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 09/19/1988
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 09/19/1988
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 09/20/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/23/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/06/1988
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 10/06/1988