Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to give special recognition to the birth and achievements of Aldo Leopold.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/11/1988Became Public Law No: 100-389.
08/11/1988Signed by President.
08/04/1988Presented to President.
08/02/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
08/02/1988House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/25/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/23/1987Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
02/02/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/11/1988Became Public Law No: 100-389.
08/11/1988Signed by President.
08/04/1988SenatePresented to President.
08/04/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
08/02/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
08/02/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
08/02/1988HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/13/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/06/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
06/29/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
06/29/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
06/29/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/25/1987SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/23/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
06/23/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/23/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/02/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/19/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/19/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/05/1987
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/20/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/20/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/20/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/20/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/20/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 05/27/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/27/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/27/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/27/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 05/27/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/27/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/27/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/27/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/27/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/27/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 05/27/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/27/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 05/27/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/27/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 05/27/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/29/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 05/29/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 05/29/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/29/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/29/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/29/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/29/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/29/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/29/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/29/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/03/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 06/03/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/03/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 06/03/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/03/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 06/16/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/16/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/16/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/16/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/16/1987
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 06/16/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/16/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/16/1987
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/16/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/16/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/16/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/16/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/16/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/16/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/16/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/16/1987
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/24/1987

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/02/1987 Referred to
06/23/1987 Markup by
06/23/1987 Reported by
House Interior and Insular Affairs06/29/1987 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands07/13/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service06/29/1987 Referred to
08/02/1988 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population07/06/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.40.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.40. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/02/1987)

Gives special recognition to the achievements of wilderness ecologist Aldo Leopold. Urges Federal land management agencies to model their activities after the conservation ethic he inspired.