Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating June 14, 1987, as "Baltic Freedom Day".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/16/1987Became Public Law No: 100-52.
06/16/1987Signed by President.
06/12/1987Presented to President.
06/11/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
06/11/1987House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/20/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/19/1987Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
01/06/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
06/16/1987Became Public Law No: 100-52.
06/16/1987Signed by President.
06/12/1987SenatePresented to President.
06/12/1987SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/11/1987HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
06/11/1987HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
06/11/1987HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/06/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/06/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/25/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/24/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/24/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/24/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/20/1987SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/19/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 41.
03/19/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/19/1987SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/06/1987SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/06/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 01/14/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/14/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 01/14/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/14/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 01/14/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/14/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 01/14/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 01/14/1987
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 01/14/1987
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 01/14/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 01/20/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 01/20/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 01/20/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 01/20/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/20/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 01/20/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 01/20/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 01/20/1987
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 01/20/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 01/20/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/21/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 01/21/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 01/27/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 01/27/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 01/28/1987
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 01/29/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/29/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/03/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/19/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/19/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/19/1987
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 02/23/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 02/26/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/10/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/11/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/11/1987
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/13/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/13/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/13/1987
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/17/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/17/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/17/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/17/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/17/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/17/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/17/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 03/17/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/17/1987
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/17/1987

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/06/1987 Referred to
03/19/1987 Markup by
03/19/1987 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs03/24/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East04/06/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations04/06/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service03/24/1987 Referred to
06/11/1987 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/25/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.5. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/06/1987)

Expresses disapproval of the refusal of the U.S.S.R. to recognize the sovereignty of the Baltic Republics.

Designates June 14, 1987, as Baltic Freedom Day.