Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/19/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/07/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/07/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/07/1987
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/07/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/07/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/07/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/07/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/07/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 04/07/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/07/1987
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 04/10/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/10/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 04/10/1987
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/10/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/10/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/10/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/10/1987
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 04/10/1987
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/21/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/28/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/28/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/28/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/28/1987
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/08/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/08/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/08/1987
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/08/1987
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/21/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/21/1987
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/21/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/21/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/21/1987
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/18/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/18/1987
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 07/22/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/28/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/28/1987
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/28/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/28/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 10/28/1987
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/28/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/19/1988
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/19/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/19/1988
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/19/1988