Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/21/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/21/1987
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/21/1987
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/21/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 05/21/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/21/1987
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/17/1987
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/17/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/17/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/17/1987
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 06/17/1987
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/17/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/17/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/17/1987
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 06/17/1987
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/17/1987
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/30/1987
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 06/30/1987
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/30/1987
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/30/1987
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/30/1987
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/30/1987
Sen. Karnes, David K. [R-NE] 06/30/1987
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/21/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/21/1987
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/21/1987
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/21/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 08/04/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/09/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/09/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/09/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 09/15/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/18/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/24/1987
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/24/1987