Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution to honor Irving Berlin for the pleasure he has given to the American people through almost a century of his music.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/30/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/29/1987Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/09/1987Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
10/30/1987Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/29/1987Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
10/29/1987Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
10/29/1987Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/09/1987Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/21/1987
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/22/1987
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/29/1987
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/29/1987
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/31/1987
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 08/07/1987
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/11/1987
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/16/1987
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/16/1987
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/16/1987
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 09/16/1987
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/16/1987
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 09/16/1987
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/16/1987
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 09/16/1987
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 09/16/1987
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/16/1987
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 09/23/1987
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/23/1987
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/23/1987
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/23/1987
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/23/1987
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/23/1987
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 09/25/1987
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/30/1987
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/01/1987
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 10/07/1987
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/07/1987
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/07/1987
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/07/1987
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/08/1987
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 10/08/1987
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/08/1987
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/08/1987
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 10/08/1987
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/09/1987
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/09/1987
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/09/1987
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/09/1987
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/09/1987
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/09/1987
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 10/09/1987
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/09/1987
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 10/09/1987
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/09/1987
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 10/09/1987
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 10/13/1987

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary07/09/1987 Referred to
10/29/1987 Markup by
10/29/1987 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.Res.246.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.246. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/09/1987)

Expresses the sense of the Senate that Irving Berlin be recognized for his musical accomplishments.