Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/01/1988
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/01/1988
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/14/1988
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/21/1988
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/11/1988
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/11/1988
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 04/18/1988
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/18/1988
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/11/1988
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/06/1988
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/15/1988
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/15/1988
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/15/1988
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/15/1988
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/15/1988
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/15/1988
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 06/15/1988
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 06/15/1988
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/15/1988
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/15/1988
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/15/1988
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/15/1988
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/15/1988
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 06/15/1988
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/15/1988
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/15/1988
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/22/1988