Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/22/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 03/14/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/14/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/14/1989
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 03/14/1989
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 03/14/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 03/14/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 03/14/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/14/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/14/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/14/1989
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 03/14/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/14/1989
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/14/1989
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/05/1989
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/05/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 04/05/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/05/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/05/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/26/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/26/1989
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/25/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/06/1989
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 06/06/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/15/1989
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/15/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 06/15/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 06/15/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/15/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/15/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 06/27/1989
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/27/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/27/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/18/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/18/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/04/1989
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 09/19/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/19/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 10/05/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 01/24/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 02/27/1990