There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Retirees Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapters 83 and 84 of title 5, United States Code, to expedite the processing of applications of Federal employees seeking retirement benefits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/22/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/14/1989Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
03/06/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
02/22/1989Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/22/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 02/22/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 02/22/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/07/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/07/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/07/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/07/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/07/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/07/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/07/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 03/07/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/07/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/07/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/07/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 03/07/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/07/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/12/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/12/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 04/12/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/12/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/18/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/18/1989
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 05/18/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/18/1989
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/18/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/18/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/18/1989
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/18/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/18/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/18/1989
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 05/18/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/19/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/19/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/12/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 07/24/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/24/1989
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/24/1989

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service02/22/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits03/06/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1059.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1059. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/22/1989)

Federal Retirees Fairness Act - Requires Federal agencies to ensure that employee personnel files include information of all Federal employment for retirement purposes within 180 days after an employee begins service with an agency.

Requires an agency, if an employee gives at least four months' to one year's notice of intent to retire, to: (1) inform such employee (or, if deceased, the employee's survivors) of any retirement counseling and applicable services; and (2) begin processing disability retirement applications not later than 30 days after the date of the application.

Sets forth a schedule for processing applications for retirement deduction refunds and death benefits.

Requires the Office of Personnel Management to compile quarterly information on the number of retirement applications submitted by agencies and their timeliness and accuracy.

Requires the agency retirement counselor to conduct seminars at least twice a year.