Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/22/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 02/22/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/22/1989
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 03/01/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/01/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/01/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/01/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/01/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/01/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/01/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/01/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/08/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/08/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/08/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/08/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/08/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/08/1989
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/08/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/15/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/15/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/15/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/15/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/15/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/15/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/15/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 03/15/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/15/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/15/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/23/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/23/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/23/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/23/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/23/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/23/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/05/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/05/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/05/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 04/05/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/05/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/13/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/13/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/13/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/13/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/13/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/13/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/26/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/02/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 05/02/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/09/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/09/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/09/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 05/18/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/18/1989
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/18/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/18/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/07/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/07/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/07/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/07/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 06/07/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/15/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/15/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/15/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/15/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/11/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 07/11/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/11/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 07/11/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/11/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/02/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 08/02/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 08/02/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 08/02/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/05/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/05/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/31/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 11/17/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/21/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/26/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew