Committees: H.R.1109 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/23/1989 Referred to
02/28/1990 Markup by
03/05/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-411
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands03/17/1989 Referred to
11/07/1989 Hearings by
02/22/1990 Markup by
02/22/1990 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/07/1990 Referred to
04/25/1990 Markup by
05/22/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-301
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests03/08/1990 Referred to
03/28/1990 Hearings by