There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Trails System Act by designating the Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
08/15/1990Became Public Law No: 101-365.
08/15/1990Signed by President.
08/09/1990Presented to President.
08/01/1990Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
05/22/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/15/1990Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment. With written report No. 101-290.
03/06/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
03/05/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-412.
02/28/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (33)

Date Chamber
08/15/1990Became Public Law No: 101-365.
08/15/1990Signed by President.
08/09/1990HousePresented to President.
08/09/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
08/01/1990-9:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/01/1990-9:59pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
08/01/1990-9:58pmHouseMr. Vento asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
05/24/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/22/1990SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/15/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 549.
05/15/1990SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment. With written report No. 101-290.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
04/25/1990SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/09/1990SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/08/1990SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/07/1990SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/06/1990-1:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/06/1990-1:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
03/06/1990-1:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/06/1990-1:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
03/06/1990-1:34pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
03/06/1990-1:34pmHouseMr. Lagomarsino demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
03/06/1990-1:34pmHouseMr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/05/1990HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251.
03/05/1990HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-412.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/28/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported Without Recommendation (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/28/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/22/1990HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
02/22/1990HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
11/07/1989HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
03/31/1989HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
03/17/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/28/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
02/28/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/28/1989 Referred to
02/28/1990 Markup by
03/05/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-412
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands03/17/1989 Referred to
11/07/1989 Hearings by
02/22/1990 Markup by
02/22/1990 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/07/1990 Referred to
04/25/1990 Markup by
05/15/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-290
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests03/08/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1159. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/22/1990)

Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail Act - Amends the National Trails System Act to include the Juan Bautista de Anza National Historic Trail, extending from Sonora, Mexico, to San Francisco, California, as a part of the System. Prohibits lands from outside the Trail from being acquired for inclusion into such Trail without the consent of the owners. Authorizes appropriations.