Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 02/28/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/18/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 04/18/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/10/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 05/10/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/10/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/23/1989
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 05/23/1989
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/23/1989
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 05/31/1989
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 05/31/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/31/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/14/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 11/01/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 11/01/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/01/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 11/02/1989
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 11/02/1989
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/07/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 11/07/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 11/07/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/07/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/07/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/07/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/15/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 11/15/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/15/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/31/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/27/1990
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 02/27/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/27/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 02/27/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 03/14/1990