Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/02/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/02/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/02/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/02/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/02/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 03/02/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/13/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/13/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/13/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/13/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/13/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/20/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/20/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/20/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/20/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/10/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/10/1989
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/10/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/10/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/10/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/10/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/09/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/28/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/28/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 09/12/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/12/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/12/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/19/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 10/31/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 11/17/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 11/17/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/06/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/06/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 03/06/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 07/20/1990