Committees: H.R.1199 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/01/1989 Referred to
06/20/1989 Markup by
06/22/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-106
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care04/12/1989 Referred to
04/12/1989 Hearings by
06/07/1989 Markup by
06/07/1989 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/11/1989 Referred to
08/02/1990 Discharged from