Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 03/01/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/10/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/12/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/12/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/12/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/12/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/12/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/12/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/12/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/12/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/12/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/12/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/12/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/12/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/12/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/12/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/25/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/25/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/25/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/25/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/25/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/25/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/25/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/25/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 04/25/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/25/1989
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 04/25/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/25/1989
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/25/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/26/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 04/26/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 04/26/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/09/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/09/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/09/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/09/1989
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/09/1989
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/09/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/09/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/09/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/09/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/09/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/09/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/09/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/09/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/09/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 05/09/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/09/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/09/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/09/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/09/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/09/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/09/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/09/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/09/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/23/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/23/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/23/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/23/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/23/1989
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/23/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/23/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/07/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/07/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/07/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/07/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/07/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/07/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/07/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/07/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/13/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/13/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/13/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/13/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/18/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/18/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/18/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/18/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/18/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/18/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/18/1989
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/03/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/03/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/03/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/03/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 08/03/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 08/03/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 09/28/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/28/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/28/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/28/1989
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 11/02/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 11/02/1989