Committees: H.R.1243 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space and Technology03/02/1989 Referred to
02/21/1990 Markup by
03/01/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-410
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development03/10/1989 Referred to
07/18/1989 Hearings by
11/17/1989 Markup by
11/17/1989 Reported by
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Transportation, Aviation and Materials09/19/1989 Referred to
02/21/1990 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/07/1990 Referred to
03/20/1990 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/20/1990 Referred to
03/28/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-258
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development03/21/1990 Referred to