Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 03/02/1989
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 04/13/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/13/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/13/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/13/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/13/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/13/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/13/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/13/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/13/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/13/1989
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/13/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 04/13/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/13/1989
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/26/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/04/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/04/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/04/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/04/1989
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/04/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 05/04/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/04/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/04/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/04/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/04/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/04/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/04/1989
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/09/1989
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 05/09/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/09/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/09/1989
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 05/09/1989
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/09/1989
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/09/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/09/1989
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 05/09/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/09/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/09/1989
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 05/11/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 05/11/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/11/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/11/1989
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 05/11/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/11/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/11/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/11/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 05/11/1989
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/11/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 05/11/1989
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/11/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/11/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/11/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/11/1989
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 05/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/11/1989
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 05/11/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/11/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/11/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/16/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/16/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/16/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/16/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/16/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/16/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/16/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 05/16/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/16/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/16/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/16/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/18/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/18/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/18/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/18/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/18/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/18/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/18/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/18/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 05/18/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/24/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/24/1989
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/24/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/31/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/31/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 05/31/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/31/1989
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/31/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 05/31/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/31/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 05/31/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/07/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/07/1989
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/07/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 06/13/1989
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/14/1989
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 06/21/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/27/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/12/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/12/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 07/20/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 09/07/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/07/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/07/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/12/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/11/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/09/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 01/23/1990