Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 03/07/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/07/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 03/07/1989
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/07/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/20/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/20/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/20/1989
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/20/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/04/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/04/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/17/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/02/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 05/16/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/16/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/16/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/16/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/16/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/16/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/31/1989
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/06/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 09/06/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/19/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/20/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/18/1990