Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/09/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 03/09/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/15/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/15/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/15/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/15/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/15/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/15/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/15/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/15/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/15/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/15/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/15/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/21/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/21/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/21/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/05/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/05/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/05/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/17/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 04/17/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/17/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/17/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/03/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/03/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/03/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/03/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/31/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/31/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/31/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/31/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 05/31/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/31/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/14/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 06/29/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/29/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 06/29/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/29/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/24/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/27/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 07/27/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/27/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/27/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/31/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 07/31/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/31/1989
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/31/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/01/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 08/01/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/06/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 09/06/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 09/06/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/06/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/06/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/06/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/12/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 09/12/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/12/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/18/1989
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 10/23/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/23/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/23/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/25/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/25/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/14/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/30/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/30/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/30/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 01/30/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/30/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 01/30/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/15/1990