Summary: H.R.1358 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/02/1989)

Provides that, for purposes of determining the commencement of time limitations for use of and eligibility for educational assistance, loans for educational or vocational assistance, and completing a program of education under the veterans' educational assistance program, the following rule shall apply: a veteran's last discharge or release from active duty shall not include any discharge or release of less than 90 days of continuous service unless the individual involved is discharged or released for a service-connected disability, for a medical condition which preexisted such service and which the Secretary concerned determines is not service-connected, for hardship, or as a result of a reduction in force.

Prohibits an individual who serves in the Selected Reserve from receiving educational assistance credit under both the armed forces' educational assistance program and the veterans' educational assistance program. Requires such individual to elect the program to which such service shall be credited.

Revises provisions concerning the secondary school education required before an individual becomes eligible for basic educational assistance.

Includes as eligible for veterans' educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill those individuals who: (1) commenced their third academic year at one of the service academies or as a member of the Senior Reserve Officer Training Corps in a program of educational assistance before January 1, 1977; (2) served on active duty for a period of more than 180 days as a commissioned officer; (3) were discharged or released from such duty under conditions other than dishonorable; and (4) submit to the Secretary of Veterans Affairs before January 1, 1990, an irrevocable election to be eligible for such assistance. Directs the Secretary to refund to any person fulfilling such requirements his or her unused contributions to the Post-Vietnam Era Veterans Education Account.

Increases the rates of subsistence allowances for veterans with service-connected disabilities. Revises provisions concerning the computation of the veterans' educational assistance allowance to state the specific amounts of such monthly allowance for full-time, three-quarter-time, and half-time pursuit of educational assistance under the program. Increases such allowance in certain instances. Revises the amount of monthly educational assistance to be paid to an eligible person pursuing an independent study program leading to a standard college degree, providing a different computation of the eligible amount if the individual is pursuing such degree entirely on an independent-study basis or if independent study is combined with resident training. Requires an individual's general entitlement to be charged for a combination of such independent study and resident training on the basis of the applicable monthly training time rate as determined by the Secretary.

Outlines the amounts of general entitlement to be charged to the eligible spouse or surviving spouse of a veteran who pursues a program of education exclusively through correspondence and is paid a monthly educational assistance allowance. Increases the amount of the monthly educational assistance allowance available to eligible persons pursuing special restorative training. Provides the specific amount of monthly allowance available to eligible veterans or eligible persons pursuing a program of apprenticeship or other on-the-job training.

Requires an individual to begin service in the Selected Reserve within one year of completing certain active duty in order to become entitled to basic educational assistance for service in the Selected Reserve. (Currently, there is no one-year requirement.)

Entitles individuals who are discharged or released from active duty for a preexisting medical condition, service-connected disability, hardship, or for the convenience of the Government and who elect to participate in the veterans' educational assistance program by revoking an earlier decision not to participate in such program to the number of months of basic educational assistance equal to the number of months such individuals served on active duty after June 30, 1985.

Permits Vietnam era veterans who served on either active duty or in the Selected Reserve to receive educational assistance benefits under the Montgomergy GI Bill if their only break in service on either duty occurred before July 1, 1985 (currently, October 19, 1984). Changes the ten-year delimiting period for the termination of such benefits to conform with such date change.