There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Agency for International Development to pay the expenses of an election observer mission for the 1989 presidential elections in Panama.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
03/31/1989Became Public Law No: 101-9.
03/31/1989Signed by President.
03/28/1989Presented to President.
03/17/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/14/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/13/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
03/31/1989Became Public Law No: 101-9.
03/31/1989Signed by President.
03/28/1989HousePresented to President.
03/27/1989SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
03/20/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/17/1989SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/15/1989SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
03/14/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/14/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/14/1989-1:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/1989-1:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/14/1989-1:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/14/1989-1:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
03/14/1989-1:29pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
03/14/1989-1:29pmHouseMr. Broomfield demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
03/14/1989-1:28pmHouseMr. Crockett moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/13/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/13/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/14/1989

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/13/1989 Referred to
03/14/1989 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1373. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/1989)

Authorizes the Agency for International Development to use funds available for development assistance and the economic support fund under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to pay the expenses of an election observer mission for the 1989 presidential elections in Panama.