Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/14/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/01/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/18/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/18/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/18/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/24/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/24/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/24/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/27/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/27/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/27/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/27/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/27/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/27/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/12/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 07/12/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/12/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 08/02/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 08/04/1989
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 09/06/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/18/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/05/1990