Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 03/15/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/26/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/26/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/26/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/26/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 04/26/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/26/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/26/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/26/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/26/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/26/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/26/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/26/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/26/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 04/26/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/26/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/26/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/25/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/25/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/25/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/25/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 05/25/1989
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/25/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/25/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 05/25/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/25/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/25/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/25/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/25/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/25/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/25/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/25/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/25/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/25/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/25/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/17/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/17/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/17/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 08/04/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/13/1989