Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 03/16/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 03/16/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/21/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 03/21/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/21/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/21/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/21/1989
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/21/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/11/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/11/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 04/11/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/11/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/11/1989
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/11/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/26/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/23/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/23/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 05/23/1989
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/23/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/23/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/23/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/08/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/08/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/08/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/08/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/29/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/29/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/29/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 06/29/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/29/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/11/1989