There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Children's Health Protection Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restrict the advertising and promotion of tobaco products.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/20/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/03/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/20/1989Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 03/20/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/13/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/13/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 04/13/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/13/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/13/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/02/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/11/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/11/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/11/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/11/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/11/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/11/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/11/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/11/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/19/1989
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 07/19/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 09/27/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/27/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/27/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/27/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/28/1990
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 04/13/1989 04/18/1989 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/20/1989 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment04/03/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1493.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1493. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/20/1989)

Children's Health Protection Act of 1989 - Sets forth limitations on tobacco product advertising, promotion, and packaging.

Includes among restrictions on advertising: (1) no pictures of anyone or anything but a single package of the product, no larger than actual size, with black print on a white background; and (2) no location in or on sports facilities or cars, boats, or sporting equipment or within 500 feet of any school attended by students under age 18.

Includes among restrictions on promotion: (1) no free samples or coupons for free or reduced cost; (2) no sponsorship of athletic, music, artistic, or other events; (3) no marketing of nontobacco products or services which bear the same name or symbol of a tobacco product, unless the name is that of a corporation in existence before 1986; and (4) no payment for the appearance of the tobacco product or its name or symbol in any movie, television show, play, or other entertainment form or on any toy or vehicle, boat, or other sports equipment, unless the name is that of a corporation in existence before 1986.

Requires tobacco product packages sold or distributed in the United States to have: (1) no depiction of a human figure, no brand name or symbol, and no picture; and (2) black print on a white background.

Grants U.S. district courts jurisdiction over civil actions brought to restrain violations of this Act. Deems any tobacco product advertised, promoted, or packaged in violation of this Act to be a misbranded drug under the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act.

Sets forth the relationship of this Act to: (1) Federal Trade Commission authority; (2) State and local regulations; and (3) requirements of the Federal Cigarette Labeling and Advertising Act and the Comprehensive Smokeless Tobacco Education Act of 1986.