Committees: H.R.150 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/1989 Referred to
11/09/1989 Markup by
11/13/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-350
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law03/27/1989 Referred to
09/21/1989 Hearings by
11/01/1989 Markup by
11/01/1989 Reported by
Senate Judiciary11/15/1989 Referred to
02/01/1990 Markup by
02/01/1990 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs12/11/1989 Referred to