Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/03/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/03/1989
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/05/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/05/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/05/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/05/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/05/1989
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 04/05/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 04/11/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/11/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/11/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/11/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/13/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/13/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/18/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/18/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/18/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/25/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/25/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/25/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/25/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/25/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/25/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/25/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/23/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 05/23/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/23/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/31/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/31/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 06/07/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/07/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/07/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 06/07/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/19/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/19/1989
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/19/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/27/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/29/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/29/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/17/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/17/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/20/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/24/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 07/24/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/05/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/05/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/05/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/12/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/17/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/23/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/23/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 10/23/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/23/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 01/23/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 01/23/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 01/31/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 01/31/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/18/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/18/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/18/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/18/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/18/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/24/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/24/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/24/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/09/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/1990