Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/03/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 01/19/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/19/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 01/19/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/19/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/19/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/19/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 01/19/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 01/19/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 01/19/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/19/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/19/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 01/19/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 01/19/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 01/19/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/06/1989
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 02/06/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 02/06/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/06/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/06/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 02/06/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 02/06/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/06/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/06/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 02/06/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/06/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 02/06/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/06/1989
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 02/06/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/06/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/06/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/22/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/22/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/22/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/22/1989
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 02/22/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/22/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/22/1989
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/22/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/22/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 02/22/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/22/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/22/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/22/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/22/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 02/22/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/22/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/22/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/22/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 02/22/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/22/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/22/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 02/22/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 02/22/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/14/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/14/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/14/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/14/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/14/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/14/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/14/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/14/1989
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 03/14/1989
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 03/14/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/14/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/05/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/05/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/05/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/05/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/24/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/24/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 05/24/1989
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/24/1989
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/24/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/24/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/20/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/20/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/20/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/29/1989
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/29/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/29/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/13/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/13/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/21/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/21/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 08/03/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/03/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 10/25/1989