Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 04/05/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 04/05/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/05/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/05/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 04/12/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/12/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/12/1989
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 04/12/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/12/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/26/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/26/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/26/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 04/26/1989
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 04/26/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/26/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 04/27/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/27/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/03/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/03/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 05/03/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/03/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/18/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/18/1989
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/18/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/18/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/24/1989
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 05/24/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/14/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/22/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/22/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/27/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/27/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/12/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/12/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 07/19/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/12/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/12/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/12/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 09/12/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/12/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/12/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/05/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 11/01/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/01/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 11/15/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/17/1989
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/17/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 01/31/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/05/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/20/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/20/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 02/26/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 03/12/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/04/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/18/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/03/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/03/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/10/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/10/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/10/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/10/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/10/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/10/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/10/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/10/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/31/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/31/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/31/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/31/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/12/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/10/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/10/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/10/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/23/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 10/24/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew