Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/03/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/03/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 05/03/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/03/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/03/1989
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/03/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/03/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/03/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/03/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/03/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/09/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/09/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/09/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 05/18/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/31/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/31/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/31/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/31/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/22/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/22/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/22/1989
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/12/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/17/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/17/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/17/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/18/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 08/04/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 09/20/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/20/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/20/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/20/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/20/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/26/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/04/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/08/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 11/17/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/31/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/21/1990