Committees: H.R.2015 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs04/17/1989 Referred to
03/22/1990 Markup by
03/29/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-388 Part 2
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Economic Stabilization05/01/1989 Referred to
03/13/1990 Markup by
03/13/1990 Reported by
House Public Works and Transportation04/17/1989 Referred to
11/17/1989 Markup by
12/01/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-388 Part 1
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Economic Development05/01/1989 Referred to
05/25/1989 Hearings by
10/25/1989 Markup by
10/25/1989 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works04/19/1990 Referred to
10/04/1990 Markup by
10/04/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-514
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure09/13/1990 Hearings by