There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Live Performing Arts Labor Relations Amendments

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Labor Relations Act to give employers and performers in the live performing arts rights given by section 8(e) of such Act to employers and employees in similarly situated industries, to give to such employers and performers the same rights given by section 8(f) of such Act to employers and employees in the construction industry, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/18/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/09/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
04/18/1989Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 04/18/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 04/18/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/03/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/03/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/14/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/13/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 08/04/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/04/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/04/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 08/04/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/04/1989
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/04/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/04/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/04/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 09/22/1989
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/22/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/22/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/22/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/22/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/22/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/22/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/22/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/22/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/22/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 09/22/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/22/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 09/22/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 09/22/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/22/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/22/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/05/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 10/05/1989
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 10/05/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/05/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 10/05/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/05/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/05/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/05/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 10/05/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/05/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/05/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/05/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/05/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/31/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/31/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 10/31/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/31/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/31/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/31/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/31/1989
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/31/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 10/31/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/31/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/31/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/31/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/20/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 11/20/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 11/20/1989
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 01/30/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/30/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 01/30/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/30/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 01/30/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/22/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/22/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/15/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/15/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/15/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/15/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/15/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/18/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/17/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/17/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/17/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/17/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/14/1990
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 06/14/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/14/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/14/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/19/1990
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 06/26/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/24/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/05/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/05/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/19/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor04/18/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations06/09/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2025. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/18/1989)

Live Performing Arts Labor Relations Amendments - Amends the National Labor Relations Act to exclude specified types of employers and performers in the live performing arts from coverage under unfair labor practice provisions: (1) prohibiting specified contracts or agreements between employers and labor organizations; and (2) prohibiting specified actions of labor organizations to force or require cessation of dealings with others, joining of labor or employer organizations, or recognition of or negotiation with labor organizations not certified as representative.

Permits such employers to: (1) agree with a labor organization to make membership in it a condition of performing arts employment; and (2) make agreements with a labor organization covering performing artists even if its majority status has not yet been established.

Defines "employer" to include purchasers of live musical performance services. Defines "employee" to include independent contractors engaged to perform live musical services.