Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/03/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 01/19/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 01/19/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/19/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 01/19/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 01/19/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/19/1989
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 01/19/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 01/19/1989
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/19/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 01/19/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 01/19/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 01/19/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/19/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 01/19/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 01/19/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 01/19/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 01/19/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/19/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/19/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 01/19/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 01/19/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 01/19/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 01/19/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 01/19/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 01/19/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 01/19/1989
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/19/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/19/1989
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/19/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/28/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/28/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/28/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/28/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/28/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/28/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/28/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/28/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/28/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 02/28/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 02/28/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/28/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/28/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/28/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 02/28/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/28/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/28/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/28/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/11/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/11/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/11/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/11/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 04/11/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/11/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/13/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/26/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 04/26/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/06/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/06/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/06/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/06/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/06/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 09/06/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/06/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/06/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/19/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 11/02/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/02/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 11/02/1989
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 11/02/1989
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/17/1990