There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to the application of employer sanctions to longshore work.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/17/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/13/1989Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 101-280.
04/27/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/20/1989SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/18/1989SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
10/17/1989-1:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/17/1989-1:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/17/1989-1:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/17/1989HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
10/17/1989-1:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/17/1989-1:06pmHouseMr. Brooks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/13/1989HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176.
10/13/1989HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 101-280.
07/28/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/28/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
07/20/1989HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law
07/20/1989HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law
06/14/1989HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law
05/02/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
04/27/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/27/1989 Referred to
07/28/1989 Markup by
10/13/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-280
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law05/02/1989 Referred to
06/14/1989 Hearings by
07/20/1989 Markup by
07/20/1989 Reported by
Senate Judiciary10/18/1989 Referred to
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs10/20/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/17/1989)

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to the application of employer sanctions to longshore work.

Defines "longshore work" to include activities relating or incident to cargo loading or unloading, including the operation of cargo-related equipment and the securing of a vessel in the United States or its coastal waters. Stipulates that for purposes of reciprocal foreign states such term includes activities with respect to vessels in such states.

Defines "reciprocal foreign state" to mean a state which permits U.S. nationals who are crewmen on U.S. ships to perform longshore work and where such work has taken place within the preceding six months.

States that any person or entity who brings a person into the United States to perform longshore work shall be considered such person's employer as of the date such work begins.

Requires such an employer to designate in writing a person or entity at a nearby U.S. port to maintain the required employment verification paperwork.

States that classification as an alien crewman shall not by itself authorize longshore work.

Provides for alternative employment verification documentation for longshore work by establishing: (1) that the alien is a national of a reciprocal foreign state; and (2) such work will be performed in connection with a reciprocal state's vessel.