Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/24/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 01/24/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/24/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/24/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 01/24/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/24/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 01/24/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 01/24/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 01/24/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/24/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/06/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 02/06/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/06/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/06/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/06/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/06/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 02/06/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/06/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 02/06/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/06/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/06/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/06/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/06/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/09/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/09/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/09/1989
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/22/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/22/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 02/22/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/22/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/22/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/22/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 02/22/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/22/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 02/22/1989
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 03/01/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/01/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/01/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/01/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/08/1989
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 03/14/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/14/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 03/14/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/14/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 03/14/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/14/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/14/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/14/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/15/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 03/15/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 03/21/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/21/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/21/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/04/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/06/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 04/11/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/11/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 04/12/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/13/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/26/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/26/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 04/26/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/26/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/26/1989
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 05/04/1989
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/04/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/04/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 05/09/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 05/09/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/09/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/11/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/11/1989
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/23/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/23/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/23/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/24/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/24/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/24/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/24/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/24/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/06/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/06/1989
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/06/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/06/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/06/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/06/1989
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/13/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/13/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/13/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/13/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/13/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/13/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/20/1989
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 06/20/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 06/20/1989
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 06/20/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/20/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/27/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/27/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/27/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/11/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/11/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/11/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 07/11/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/11/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/11/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/11/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/13/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/13/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/20/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/20/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/20/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/20/1989
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/26/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/26/1989
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/26/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/26/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/26/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/01/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 08/01/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 08/01/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/01/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/01/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 08/01/1989
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/04/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/04/1989
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 08/04/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 09/06/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/06/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 09/06/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/06/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/06/1989
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 09/06/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/06/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/06/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/06/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/13/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/13/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/13/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/13/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 09/13/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 09/13/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/28/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/28/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/28/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/28/1989
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/28/1989
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 09/28/1989
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/11/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/11/1989
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 10/12/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 10/12/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/12/1989
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 10/12/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/19/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/19/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 10/23/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 10/23/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 10/23/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/23/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/23/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/25/1989
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/25/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/25/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/25/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/26/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/26/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 10/31/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 10/31/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/07/1989