Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 05/02/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/02/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 05/02/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/16/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 05/16/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/16/1989
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/16/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/12/1989
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 06/29/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/29/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/12/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/05/1989
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 10/05/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/12/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/12/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/18/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/26/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/01/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/01/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/07/1989
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 11/21/1989
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/30/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 01/30/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/17/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/17/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/17/1990
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 05/17/1990