There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 34 of title 38, United States Code, with respect to the time period during which benefits under such chapter may be utilized by certain eligible veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/02/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/02/1989Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 05/16/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/16/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/16/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 05/16/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/16/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/16/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/16/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/18/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/18/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/18/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/18/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/18/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/18/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/24/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 05/24/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 05/24/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/24/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/24/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/24/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/24/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/24/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/24/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 06/06/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/06/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/06/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/06/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/06/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/06/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/13/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/13/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/13/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/13/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/20/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/20/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/20/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/28/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/11/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/11/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/13/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/24/1989
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/06/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 09/06/1989
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 09/06/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 09/28/1989
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/28/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 10/05/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/19/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/19/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/31/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 11/13/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 11/13/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/13/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 11/15/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 11/15/1989
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/15/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 11/16/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/20/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/20/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/20/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 11/21/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 11/21/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 11/21/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 11/21/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 01/24/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 03/21/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/02/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2192.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2192. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/02/1989)

Precludes veterans entitled to benefits under the All Volunteer Force Educational Assistance Program from receiving other veterans' educational assistance.

Terminates other veterans' educational assistance as of June 30, 1993.