Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 05/11/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 05/11/1989
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 05/11/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/25/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 05/25/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/25/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/25/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/25/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/25/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/25/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/25/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/25/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/25/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/28/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/28/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/28/1989
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/28/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/28/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/28/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/28/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 06/28/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/28/1989
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 06/28/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/03/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 08/03/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 08/03/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 08/03/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 08/03/1989
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 08/03/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 08/03/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 08/03/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 08/03/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 08/03/1989
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 09/06/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/20/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/21/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/26/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/26/1989
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/26/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 10/26/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/17/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/29/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 01/29/1990