There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate May 30 of each year as Memorial Day.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/16/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/23/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
05/16/1989Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/25/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/25/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 05/25/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/06/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/06/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/06/1989
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 06/06/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/06/1989
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 06/06/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 06/14/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/14/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/14/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/14/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/22/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/29/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/29/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/11/1989
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 07/11/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/11/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/20/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/20/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/27/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/31/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/31/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 07/31/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/31/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 07/31/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/02/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/02/1989
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 08/04/1989
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/07/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/07/1989
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 09/20/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/19/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 06/20/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/20/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/26/1990
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/29/1989 07/13/1989 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service05/16/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population05/23/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2360.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2360. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/1989)

Changes the date for which Memorial Day is designated as a legal public holiday from the last Monday in May to May 30.

Changes Memorial Day as a particular day for displaying the flag from the last Monday in May to May 30.

Makes Memorial Day an exception to the observance on Mondays.